Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977852

EP0977852 - FAMILY OF IMMUNOREGULATORS DESIGNATED LEUKOCYTE IMMUNOGLOBULIN-LIKE RECEPTORS (LIR) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.04.2013  [2013/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Immunex Corporation
51 University Street Seattle
Washington 98101 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
IMMUNEX CORPORATION
51 University Street
Seattle Washington 98101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COSMAN, David, J.
9808 Mandus Olson Road N.E.
Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Dörries, Hans Ulrich , et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/04]Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr. , et al
Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date98918667.123.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US08244
Priority number, dateUS1997084224824.04.1997         Original published format: US 842248
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848017
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977852
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N15/62, A61K38/17, C07K16/28
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:DAMILIE VON IMMUNREGULATOREN MIT DER BEZEICHNUNG LEUKOZYTEN IMMUNGLOBULIN-ÄHNLICHE REZEPTOREN (LIR)[2000/06]
English:FAMILY OF IMMUNOREGULATORS DESIGNATED LEUKOCYTE IMMUNOGLOBULIN-LIKE RECEPTORS (LIR)[2000/06]
French:FAMILLE D'IMMUNOREGULATEUR APPELES RECEPTEURS DES LEUCOCYTES, RESSEMBLANT A L'IMMUNOGLOBULINE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
04.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/17]
04.12.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9809638  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-8,10-20 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9824906  (SCHERING CORP [US]) [E] 1,3-8,10-17,19,20 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9831806  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3,4,6-8,10-12,16,17,19,20 * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 3; claims 1,18-23,33-37 *
 [X]  - SAMARIS, J. AND M. COLONNA, "Cloning of novel immunoglobin superfamily receptors expressed on human myeloid and lymphoid cells: structural evidence for new stimulatory and inhibitory pathways.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 27, pages 660 - 5, XP002074916 [X] 1,3-8,10-12,16,17,19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830270313
 [X]  - ROJO, S. ET AL., "Type I transmembrane receptor with inhibitory function in mouse mast cells and NK cells.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19970101), vol. 158, no. 1, pages 9 - 12, XP002074918 [X] 1,8,16,17,19,20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LANIER, L.L., "Natural killer cell receptors and MHC class I interactions.", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (199702), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 126 - 31, XP002074917 [A] * page 126, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(97)80169-0
 [PXT]  - BORGES, L. ET AL., "A family of human lymphoid and myeloid Ig-like receptors, some of which bind to MHC class I molecules.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19971201), vol. 159, no. 11, pages 5192 - 6, XP002074919 [PX] 1,3-8,10-17,19 * the whole document * [T] 2
 [PX]  - COSMAN, D. ET AL., "A novel immunoglobin superfamily receptor for cellular and viral MHC class I molecules.", IMMUNITY, (199708), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 273 - 282, XP002074986 [PX] 1,3-8,10,14-17,19,20 * abstract * * page 279, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 274, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80529-4
 [PX]  - ARM, J.P. ET AL., "Molecular identification of a novel family of human Ig superfamily members that possess immunoreceptor tyrosine-based inhibition and homology to the mouse gp49B1 inhibitory receptor.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19970901), vol. 159, no. 5, pages 2342 - 9, XP002074920 [PX] 1,3-8,10-17,19,20 * figure 5 *
by applicantEP0036776
 US4411993
 US5516658
    - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1978), vol. 75, page 615,
    - GOEDDEL ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, page 544,
    - GOEDDEL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057,
    - MANIATIS, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, page 412,
    - HITZEMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1980), vol. 255, page 2073,
    - HESS ET AL., J. ADV. ENZYME REG., (1968), vol. 7, page 149,
    - HOLLAND ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1978), vol. 17, page 4900,
    - URDAL ET AL., J. CHROMATOG, (1984), vol. 296, page 171,
    - KOZLOSKY, ONCOGENE, (1995), vol. 10, pages 299 - 306,
    - HAYMERLE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 8615,