Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979048

EP0979048 - DRAWER SLIDE MOUNTING BRACKET WITH GUSSETTED MOUNTING TAB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACCURIDE INTERNATIONAL, Inc.
12311 Shoemaker Avenue Santa Fe Springs
California 90670-4721 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
ACCURIDE INTERNATIONAL, Inc.
12311 Shoemaker Avenue
Santa Fe Springs, California 90670-4721 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Liu, Zunquan
3500 Pennsylvania Avenue, Apt. 107
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAMMENS, Arthur, E.
3032 Arlington Avenue
Fullerton, CA 92385 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date98918681.222.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08270
Priority number, dateUS1997084151523.04.1997         Original published format: US 841515
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847411
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979048
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/00, A47B88/04
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/07]A47B88/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:MIT EINSATZLASCHE VERSEHENE HALTERUNG FÜR SCHLUBKASTENAUSZUGSFÜHRUNG[2000/07]
English:DRAWER SLIDE MOUNTING BRACKET WITH GUSSETTED MOUNTING TAB[2000/07]
French:SUPPORT DE MONTAGE POUR GLISSIERE DE TIROIR, DOTE D'UNE PATTE DE MONTAGE A GOUSSET[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Search fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3778120  (HAGEN M, et al) [A] 1-3,6,7,22-30 * abstract *;
 [A]US4834555  (GRASS ALFRED [AT]) [A] 1-3,6,7,22-30 * abstract *;
 [A]US5359752  (DOMENIG GEORG [US]) [A] 1-3,6,7,22-30 * abstract *
International search[X]US4838627  (MACIAS JORGE [US]);
 [X]CA537567  (STANLEY WORKS);
 [X]US4181279  (PERRAULT FREDERICK [US], et al)