Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981806

EP0981806 - INTELLIGENT CURRENCY HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cummins-Allison Corp.
891, Freehanville Drive Mount Prospect
Illinois 60056 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION
891, Freehanville Drive
Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION
891, Feehanville Drive
Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAZUR, Richard, A.
1508 Culpepper Drive
Naperville, IL 60540 / US
02 / CSULITS, Frank, S.
18192 Banbury Drive
Grunee, IL 60031 / US
03 / MENNIE, Douglas, U.
229 Wood Street
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98918715.824.04.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US08326
Priority number, dateUS1997085240007.05.1997         Original published format: US 852400
US19980075991P25.02.1998         Original published format: US 75991 P
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850892
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981806
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/00, G07D7/16
[2001/01]
Former International [2000/09]G07D7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/09]
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTES GELDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2000/09]
English:INTELLIGENT CURRENCY HANDLING SYSTEM[2000/09]
French:SYSTEME INTELLIGENT DE MANIPULATION DES DEVISES[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Search fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
13.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
16.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2107911  (CUBIC WESTERN DATA) [A] 1,2,5,7,8,16,18,22-24,29,31-36,43,47,61,62 * page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 42 - line 50 * * figure 7; claims 1-3,6,7 *
International search[X]US5295196  (RATERMAN DONALD E [US], et al);
 [X]US4707843  (MCDONALD RONALD [US], et al);
 [Y]US5580311  (HASTE III THOMAS E [US]);
 [XP]US5640463  (CSULITS FRANK M [US])
by applicantUS5687963
 US5122754
 US3764899
 US3815021
 US4381447
 US4255651
 US19960715029
 US19950494091