Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978201

EP0978201 - INTERCEPTING CALL COMMUNICATIONS WITHIN AN INTELLIGENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Jing
4245 Pinewood Drive
Plano, TX 75093 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Nyberg, Bengt , et al
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Nyberg, Bengt , et al
DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB, P.O. Box 17192
104 62 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98918748.923.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US08379
Priority number, dateUS1997084752524.04.1997         Original published format: US 847525
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9848574
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978201
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:RUFÜBERTRAGUNGSABFANG IN EINEM INTELLIGENTEN NETZWERK[2000/06]
English:INTERCEPTING CALL COMMUNICATIONS WITHIN AN INTELLIGENT NETWORK[2000/06]
French:INTERCEPTION DE CONNEXIONS D'APPEL DANS UN RESEAU INTELLIGENT[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2000
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5590171  (HOWE WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1,9,15 * column A * * column 1, line 35 - line 42 * * column 3, line 40 - line 61 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 26 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 44 *;
 [A]EP0669771  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 35 * * column 3, line 44 - line 53 *