Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990004 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990004



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 94
23.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12
23.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
16.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.03.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
22.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
22.10.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.10.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.03.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.03.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
19.10.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.10.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.12.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
08.02.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
14.02.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
22.05.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
27.06.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1