blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990004


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.06.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
21.06.2002 (Expected) grant published on  07.08.2002  [2002/32]
31.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.05.2002 Renewal fee
11.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
11.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant
12.10.2001 First examination report
11.10.2001 Communication of intention to grant
20.02.2001 Renewal fee
31.03.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
08.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication