Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002506478Global Dossier 26.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0990004Global Dossier 07.08.2002B1
EP0990004 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU730639B 08.03.2001B2
AU7162398 19.01.1999A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9810454 05.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2288857 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69807079T 05.12.2002T2
DE69807079D 12.09.2002D1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0004087 28.04.2001A3
HU0004087 28.03.2001A2
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL337689 28.08.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US9808392 24.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5948874 07.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
US6597498 24.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900432Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1261378 26.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO5040129 29.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2181206T 16.02.2003T3
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID22688 09.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US5082997 26.06.1997