Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990004

EP0990004 - IMPROVED ACID CATALYZED POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / PIKE, William, C.
2816 Ronan Street
Midland, MI 48642 / US
02 / PRIDDY, Duane, B.
3207 Travis Court
Midland, MI 48642 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Raynor, John , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Raynor, John , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date98918759.624.04.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US08392
Priority number, dateUS19970050829P26.06.1997         Original published format: US 50829 P
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900432
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990004
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990004
Date:07.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F12/04
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE SÄUREKATALYSIERTE POLYMERISATION[2000/14]
English:IMPROVED ACID CATALYZED POLYMERIZATION[2000/14]
French:PERFECTIONNEMENT DE POLYMERISATION CATALYSEE PAR UN ACIDE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
19.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2002Fee for grant paid
15.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9213904  (DOW CHEMICAL);
 [A]WO9618663  (DOW CHEMICAL)