Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979235

EP0979235 - ISOLATED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE CODING FOR TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN PRECURSORS MAGE-C1 AND MAGE-C2 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
1345 Avenue of the Americas New York
New York 10105 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
1345 Avenue of the Americas New York
New York 10105 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
1345 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUCAS, Sophie
Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459
B-1200 Brussels / BE
02 / DE SMET, Charles
Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459
B-1200 Brussels / BE
03 / BOON-FALLEUR, Thierry
Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459
B-1200 Brussels / BE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Jump, Timothy John Simon , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Jump, Timothy John Simon , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98918810.724.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08493
Priority number, dateUS1997084552825.04.1997         Original published format: US 845528
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849184
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979235
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979235
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/04, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/12, G01N33/574, C07K5/00, C07K7/00, C07K16/00, C07K17/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:ISOLIERTES NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜL, DAS DIE TUMORABSTOSSUNGS-ANTIGENVORLÄUFER MAGE- C1 UND MAGE-C2 KODIERT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG[2000/07]
English:ISOLATED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE CODING FOR TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN PRECURSORS MAGE-C1 AND MAGE-C2 AND USES THEREOF[2000/07]
French:MOLECULE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ISOLEE CODANTE POUR LE PRECURSEUR D'ANTIGENE DE REJET TUMORAL MAGE-C1 ET MAGE-C2 ET SES UTILISATIONS[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase19.11.1999National basic fee paid 
19.11.1999Search fee paid 
19.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2005Fee for grant paid
25.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
18.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:SearchWO9423031  [ ] (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]);
 WO9523874  [ ] (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]);
 [A]  "Tumour rejection antigen MAGE-4 gene", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AAQ72482, XP002221384 [A] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  "MZ2-MEL antigen E precursor", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AAT05086, XP002221385 [A] 4 * abstract *
 [PX]  LUCAS SOPHIE ET AL, "Identification of a new MAGE gene with tumor-specific expression by representational difference analysis.", CANCER RESEARCH, (19980215), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 743 - 752, XP001120296 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [T]  CHEN ET AL, "Identification of multiple cancer/testis antigens by allogenic antibody screening of a melanoma cell line library", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199806), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6919 - 6923, XP002132946 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.12.6919
International search[Y]US5512444  (PATARD JEAN-JACQUES [BE], et al);
 [Y]  - INOUE H., ET AL., "THE EXPRESSION OF TUMOR-REJECTION ANTIGEN "MAGE" GENES IN HUMAN GASTRIC CARCINOMA.", Gastroenterology, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951101), vol. 109., doi:10.1016/0016-5085(95)90639-8, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1522 - 1525., XP002911530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0016-5085(95)90639-8
 [Y]  - TAM J P, ET AL., "INCORPORATION OF T AND B EPITOPES ON THE CIRCUMSPOROZOITE PROTEIN IN A CHEMICALLY DEFINED SYNTHETIC VACCINE AGAINST MALARIA", The Journal of Experimental Medicine, Rockefeller University Press, US, US, (19900101), vol. 171, doi:10.1084/jem.171.1.299, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 299 - 306, XP002911531

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.171.1.299
 [Y]  - ITOH K, ET AL., "HUMAN TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGENS MAGE", Journal of Biochemistry, Oxford University Press, GB, GB, (19960101), vol. 119, no. 03, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 385 - 390, XP002911532
 [Y]  - THOMSON S A, ET AL., "MINIMAL EPITOPES EXPRESSED IN A RECOMBINANT POLYEPITOPE PROTEIN ARE PROCESSED AND PRESENTED TO CD8+ CYTOTOXIC T CELLS: IMPLICATIONSFOR VACCINE DESIGN", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19950601), vol. 92, doi:10.1073/pnas.92.13.5845, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5845 - 5849, XP002911533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.13.5845
 [Y]  - THOMSON S A, ET AL., "RECOMBINANT POLYEPITOPE VACCINES FOR THE DELIVERY OF MULTIPLE CD8 CYTOTOXIC T CELL EPITOPES", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, The American Association of Immunologists, US, US, (19960101), vol. 157, no. 02, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 822 - 826, XP002911534