Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979071

EP0979071 - MICROPARTICLES USEFUL AS ULTRASONIC CONTRAST AGENTS AND FOR DELIVERY OF DRUGS INTO THE BLOODSTREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Point Biomedical Corporation
887A Industrial Road
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / OTTOBONI, Thomas, B.
1211 North Road
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
02 / SHORT, Robert, E.
240 Almendra Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
03 / YAMAMOTO, Ronald, K.
1321 Waller Street
San Francisco, CA 94117 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Baldock, Sharon Claire
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Baldock, Sharon Claire
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98918899.030.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08827
Priority number, dateUS1997084715330.04.1997         Original published format: US 847153
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848783
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979071
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979071
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/50
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:MIKROPARTIKEL, GEEIGNET ALS KONTRASTMITTEL IM ULTRASCHALL UND ZUR WIRKSTOFFGABE IN DEN BLUTKREISLAUF[2000/07]
English:MICROPARTICLES USEFUL AS ULTRASONIC CONTRAST AGENTS AND FOR DELIVERY OF DRUGS INTO THE BLOODSTREAM[2000/07]
French:MICROPARTICULES UTILISABLES COMME AGENTS DE CONTRASTE OU POUR LA LIBERATION DE MEDICAMENTS DANS LE FLUX SANGUIN[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Search fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
10.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2007Fee for grant paid
17.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
LU30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
[2017/13]
Former [2010/28]CY07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
LU30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2010/05]CY07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/13]DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/51]DK07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/42]DK07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2008/35]DK07.11.2007
SE07.02.2008
Former [2008/23]SE07.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0458745  (SINT SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-22,24-28,33-44,47,48,50-56 * claims 1-30 * [A] 4,23,29-32,45,46,49;
 [E]US6045777  (CHURCH CHARLES C [US], et al) [E] 1-56 * claims 1-19 *;
 [XA]WO9428873  (UNGER EVAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-9,25,32,55,56 * claims 1-19 * [A] 10-24,26-31,33-54;
 [Y]US5611344  (BERNSTEIN HOWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-56 * claims 1-16 *;
 [Y]WO9112823  (DELTA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-56 * example 1; claims 1-16 *;
 [Y]WO9106287  (ENZYTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-56 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - WALDAY PER ET AL, "Biodistributions of air-filled albumin microspheres in rats and pigs", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 299, no. 2, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 437 - 443, XP002265789 [Y] 1-56 * abstract *
 [PY]  - IJICHI K ET AL, "MULTI-LAYERED GELATIN/ACACIA MICROCAPSULES BY COMPLEX COACERVATION METHOD", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING OF JAPAN, SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS. TOKYO, JP, (19971001), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9592, pages 793 - 798, XP000723863 [PY] 1-56 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1252/jcej.30.793
International search[Y]US5271961  (MATHIOWITZ EDITH [US], et al);
 [Y]US5041292  (FEIJEN JAN [NL]);
 [Y]US5569468  (MODI PANKAJ [CA]);
 [YP]US5679377  (BERNSTEIN HOWARD [US], et al);
 [Y]EP0398935  (SCHERING AG [DE])