Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979371

EP0979371 - ENERGY ATTENUATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A SYSTEM CONVEYING PRESSURIZED LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fluid Routing Solutions, Inc.
1955 Enterprise Drive
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
[2008/01]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
DAYCO PRODUCTS, LLC.
One Prestige Place
Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
DAYCO PRODUCTS, INC.
One Prestige Place
Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COOPER, Jack, R.
21710 Morley
Dearborn, MI 48124 / US
02 / CHEN, Yungrwei
6178 Mission Drive
West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Riedel, Peter , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei
Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei, Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner, Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98918903.027.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08847
Priority number, dateUS1997084691230.04.1997         Original published format: US 846912
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849487
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979371
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/04
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:ENERGIEDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUM FÖRDERN VON UNTERDRUCKFLÜSSIGKEIT[2000/07]
English:ENERGY ATTENUATION APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A SYSTEM CONVEYING PRESSURIZED LIQUID[2000/07]
French:APPAREIL D'ATTENUATION D'ENERGIE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT POUR SYSTEME TRANSPORTANT UN LIQUIDE SOUS PRESSION[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Search fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
03.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2008
28.08.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
29.09.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/26]
31.01.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
11.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9618065  (DAYCO EUROPE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,13-15 * page 4, line 17 - page 11, line 11; figures 1-4 *
International search[X]US4043539  (GILMER WILLIAM N, et al);
 [Y]US3532125  (EVERETT WILHELM SYDOW, et al);
 [Y]US2899979  ;
 [A]US3842940  (BONIKOWSKI L);
 [A]US4064963  (KAAN PETER, et al);
 [A]US5025890  (HISASHIGE NOBUYASU [JP], et al)