Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927019

EP0927019 - COMPOSITIONS FOR COSMETIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2001 [2001/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDLOGIC GLOBAL CORPORATION
4815 List Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
MedLogic Global Corporation
4815 List Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RON, Eyal, S.
7 Coach Road
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
02 / HAND, Barry, J.
145 Butternut Hollow
Acton, MA 01718 / US
03 / BROMBERG, Lev, S.
17 Sherwood Road
Swampscott, MA 01907 / US
04 / KEARNEY, Marie
342 Faneuil Street 1
Brighton, MA 02135 / US
05 / SCHILLER, Matthew, E.
23C Sagamore Way
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
06 / AHEARN, Peter, M.
63 Webster Street
Whitman, MA 02382 / US
07 / LUCZAK, Scott
3 Remsen Avenue
Medfield, MA 02052 / US
08 / MENDUM, Thomas, H., E.
45 Columbus Avenue 1
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
[1999/27]
Representative(s)des Termes, Monique , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]Des Termes, Monique , et al
c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98918925.301.05.1998
[1999/27]
WO1998US08931
Priority number, dateUS1997084688301.05.1997         Original published format: US 846883
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848768
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927019
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[1999/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00, A61K7/021, A61K7/025, A61K7/06, A61K7/09, A61K7/16, A61K7/32, A61K7/42, A61K31/74
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/27]
Extension statesAL11.01.1999
LT11.01.1999
LV11.01.1999
RO11.01.1999
SI11.01.1999
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DIE KOSMETOLOGIE[1999/27]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR COSMETIC APPLICATIONS[1999/27]
French:COMPOSITIONS UTILISABLES EN COSMETOLOGIE[1999/27]
Entry into regional phase11.01.1999National basic fee paid 
11.01.1999Search fee paid 
11.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
01.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/24]
09.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AP]US5662892  ;
 [Y]US5106609