Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981411

EP0981411 - HYBRID LAY-UP TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.04.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2014  [2014/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.
P.O. Box 780008 K11-60
Wichita, KS 67278-0008 / US
[2006/24]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
THE BOEING COMPANY
P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 6Y-25
Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ENGWALL, Dwight, L.
1530 E. 84th Street S.
Wichita, KS 67233 / US
02 / MORROW, Christopher, J.
541 S. Crestway
Wichita, KS 67218 / US
03 / STEEN, Kevin, J.
907 Breckenridge Court
Wichita, KS 67207 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Roger, A.
2456 S. Oak
Wichita, KS 67217 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/09]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98918957.604.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US09183
Priority number, dateUS19970045742P06.05.1997         Original published format: US 45742 P
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850180
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981411
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B21B15/00, B29C70/54, B29C33/38, B29C70/34, B29C70/44, B23Q3/08
[2003/26]
Former International [2000/09]B21B15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/09]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDES AUFLEGEWERKZEUG[2000/09]
English:HYBRID LAY-UP TOOL[2000/09]
French:OUTIL HYBRIDE POUR LE MOULAGE DE STRATIFIES[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Search fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
09.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/20]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
18.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201316   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5520758  (KELMAN JOSH [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5168787  (BLAIMSCHEIN GOTTFRIED [AT]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29507068U  (KIEFEL GMBH PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
International search[XE]US5746553  (ENGWALL DWIGHT L [US]);
 [A]US5368807  (LINDSAY WILLIAM E [US]);
 [A]US5242523  (WILLDEN KURTIS S [US], et al);
 [A]US5071338  (DUBLINSKI ALEX C [US], et al);
 [A]US4882118  (MEGARRY THOMAS J [GB]);
 [A]US4475976  (MITTELSTADT ROBERT F [US], et al);
 [A]US5382150  (HENRIO PHILIPPE [FR]);
 [A]US5403537  (SEAL ELLIS C [US], et al);
 [A]US5454895  (IMPARATO SABATO I [IT]);
 [A]US5126000  (TAKAI OSAMU [JP], et al);
 [A]US4786351  (ELLIOTT GEORGE M [US], et al);
 [A]US5624512  (BOSZOR SAMUEL M [US]);
 [A]US4554036  (NEWSOM COSBY M [US]);
 [A]US5716488  (BRYANT WILLIAM J [US]);
 [A]US5601852  (SEEMANN WILLIAM [US]);
 [A]US4063705  (VODRA RICHARD J);
 [A]US4664737  (SCHLOSSTEIN HUGH R [US]);
 [A]US5145297  (MCGRATH JR PATRICK J [US]);
 [A]US4907479  (NASU NOBUO [JP]);
 [A]US5071503  (BERMAN MICHAEL [IL])