Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971692

EP0971692 - SPECIFIC MAGNETOSOME, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 2
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin
Hofgartenstrasse 2
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
D-13125 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin
Hofgartenstrasse 2
80539 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÄUERLEIN, Edmund
Gräfelfinger Strasse 72
D-81375 München / DE
02 / SCHÜLER, Dirk
Mittelstrasse 9
D-39418 Sta furt / DE
03 / RESZKA, Regina
Goethestrasse 23
D-16341 Schwanebeck / DE
04 / PÄUSER, Sabine
Lohmühlenstrasse 22
D-12435 Berlin / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Baumbach, Friedrich
Patentanwalt
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Baumbach, Friedrich, Dr.
Patentanwalt, Robert-Rössle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98919046.706.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998DE00668
Priority number, dateDE199710932207.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19709322
DE199711673214.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716732
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9840049
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971692
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971692
Date:05.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:SPEZIFISCHE MAGNETOSOMEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2000/03]
English:SPECIFIC MAGNETOSOME, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF[2000/03]
French:MAGNETOSOMES SPECIFIQUES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
19.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2002Fee for grant paid
04.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI05.03.2003
DK05.06.2003
SE05.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
[2004/23]
Former [2004/04]FI05.03.2003
SE05.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2003/50]FI05.03.2003
SE05.06.2003
Former [2003/41]FI05.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US4677067  (SCHWARTZ BRIAN B [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8,12,14-16
 [XP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, [XP] 1
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002900174 [A] 1,3,6,7,9,12