Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972057

EP0972057 - METHOD FOR SCREENING ANTIMYCOTICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HINNEN, Albert
Scheidlerstrasse 17
D-07745 Jena / DE
02 / HEGEMANN, Johannes
Nikolausstra e 39
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / MUNDER, Thomas
Engelplatz 3
D-07743 Jena / DE
04 / SCHUSTER, Tilmer
Eichenweg 40
D-97440 Werneck / DE
05 / FELDMANN, Horst
Pasinger Heuweg 86
D-80999 München / DE
06 / KRAMER, Wilfried
Strasse an der St. Vinzenz Kirche 10
D-37077 Göttingen / DE
07 / ZIMMERMANN, Friedrich, Karl
Goethestrasse 12
D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
08 / ENTIAN, Karl-Dieter
Oberurseler Strasse 43
D-61440 Oberursel / DE
09 / ROSE, Matthias
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 4
D-61267 Neu-Anspach / DE
10 / KÖTTER, Peter
Industriestrasse 3A
D-61440 Oberursel / DE
[2000/14]
Former [2000/03]01 / HINNEN, Albert
Scheidlerstrasse 17
D-07745 Jena / DE
02 / HEGEMANN, Johannes
In den Gärten 33
D-35398 Giessen / DE
03 / MUNDER, Thomas
Engelplatz 3
D-07743 Jena / DE
04 / SCHUSTER, Tilmer
Eichenweg 40
D-97440 Werneck / DE
05 / FELDMANN, Horst
Pasinger Heuweg 86
D-80999 München / DE
06 / KRAMER, Wilfried
Strasse an der St. Vinzenz Kirche 10
D-37077 Göttingen / DE
07 / ZIMMERMANN, Friedrich, Karl
Goethestrasse 12
D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
08 / ENTIAN, Karl-Dieter
Oberurseler Strasse 43
D-61440 Oberursel / DE
09 / ROSE, Matthias
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 4
D-61267 Neu-Anspach / DE
10 / KÖTTER, Peter
Industriestrasse 3A
D-61440 Oberursel / DE
Application number, filing date98919205.902.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998EP01904
Priority number, dateDE199711357202.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713572
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9844135
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972057
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972057
Date:26.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/81, C12Q1/68
[2006/06]
Former International [2000/03]C12N15/81, C12N15/00, C12Q1/68, C12N1/19, C12Q1/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING VON ANTIMYKOTISCH WIRKENDEN SUBSTANZEN[2000/03]
English:METHOD FOR SCREENING ANTIMYCOTICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCES[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE DEPISTAGE DE SUBSTANCES A ACTION ANTIMYCOSIQUE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
17.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
17.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2006Fee for grant paid
09.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Request for further processing for:10.06.2005Request for further processing filed
10.06.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
AT02.04.2007
LU02.04.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/39]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
AT02.04.2007
Former [2008/21]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2008/16]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/29]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/21]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/17]FI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[XDY]WO9511969  (RIBOGENE INC) [XD] 1,2,5,9-13,15,16,19-22,24 * abstract * * page 8 - page 13 * * page 21, line 14 - line 37 * * page 32, line 1 - line 16 * * page 33, line 20 - line 37 * * page 34, line 26 - line 30 * * page 48, line 18 - line 27 * * page 65, line 25 - page 70, line 17 * * claim 62 * [Y] 14,18,23;
 [X]WO9534678  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1,12,13,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - line 29 *;
 [X]US5614377  (BULAWA CHRISTINE E) [X] 1,13,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 20 - line 44 * * examples 4,5 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0627491  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1,12,15 * abstract * * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9506132  (MYCO PHARM INC ;UNIV GEORGIA (US)) [X] 1,2,13,15 * abstract *;
 [XP]EP0816511  (HANS KNOELL INST FUER NATURSTO) [XP] 1,2,12,13 * the whole document * * examples 4,7,8,10 *
 [DY]  - GÜLDENER U. ET AL., "A new efficient gene disruption cassette for repeated use in budding yeast", NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (1996), vol. 24, no. 13, pages 2519 - 2524, XP002074211 [DY] 14,18,23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TUITE M.F., "Antifungal drug development: the identification of new targets", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199207), vol. 10, pages 235 - 239, XP002074212 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(92)90231-J
 [A]  - VAHLENSIECK H F ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF THE YEAST ACC1 GENE PRODUCT (ACETYL-COA CARBOXYLASE) AS THE TARGET OF THE POLYKETIDE FUNGICIDE SORAPHEN A", CURRENT GENETICS, (19940201), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 95 - 100, XP000196332 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00309532
 [A]  - ENTIAN K.D. ET AL., "YGR046W, hypothetical 44.2 kDa protein; from S. cerevisiae Chromosome VII", SWISS PROT, (19961001), XP002074214 [A] 3,4,6-8,17,25-30 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - MUMBERG D. ET AL., "Regulatable promoters of S. cerevisiae: comparison of transcriptional activity and their use for heterologous expression", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, no. 25, pages 5767 - 5768, XP002074213 [AD] 12,19 * the whole document *