Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072135

EP1072135 - FRAME STRUCTURE AND FRAME SYNCHRONISATION FOR MULTICARRIER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / EBERLEIN, Ernst
Waldstrasse 28 b
D-91091 Gro enseebach / DE
02 / BADRI, Sabah
Sebaldusstrasse 8
D-91058 Erlangen / DE
03 / LIPP, Stefan
Steinweg 9 a
D-91058 Erlangen / DE
04 / BUCHHOLZ, Stephan
Kerschlacher Strasse 8
D-81447 München / DE
05 / HEUBERGER, Albert
Hausäckerweg 18
D-91056 Erlangen / DE
06 / GERHÄUSER, Heinz
Saugendorf 17
D-91344 Waischenfeld / DE
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2001/43]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Former [2001/05]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date98919265.314.04.1998
[2001/05]
WO1998EP02169
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953665
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1072135
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1072135
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/05]
TitleGerman:RAHMENSTRUKTUR UND -SYNCHRONISATION FÜR MEHRTRÄGERSYSTEME[2001/05]
English:FRAME STRUCTURE AND FRAME SYNCHRONISATION FOR MULTICARRIER SYSTEMS[2001/05]
French:SYNCHRONISATION ET STRUCTURE DE TRAMES POUR DES SYSTEMES A PORTEUSES MULTIPLES[2001/12]
Former [2001/05]SYNCHRONISATION APPROXIMATIVE DE FREQUENCES POUR DES SYSTEMES A PORTEUSES MULTIPLES
Entry into regional phase10.11.2000National basic fee paid 
10.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
10.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
26.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
18.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2001Fee for grant paid
30.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.04.2002
[2015/21]
Former [2007/17]CY30.04.2002
LU30.04.2002
Former [2004/10]CY30.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0631406  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1-7,9,15,24-30,32,38 * page 3, line 27 - line 28 *;
 [A]WO9800946  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1,4,9,15,24,27,32,38 * page 17, line 16 - line 22 * * page 26, line 17 - page 27, line 2 * * page 27, line 14 - line 24 * * page 28, line 4 - line 16 *;
 [AD]  - MOOSE, "A technique for orthogonal frequency division multiplexing frequency offset correction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS., NEW YORK, US, (199410), vol. 42, no. 10, pages 2908 - 2914, XP002019915 [AD] 1,4,9,15,24,27,32,38 * page 2908, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 2911, column R, paragraph 5 - page 2912, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.328961
 [A]  - KELLER; HANZO, "Orthogonal frequency division muliplex synchronisation techniques for wireless local area networks", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, New York, US, (19961015), pages 963 - 967, XP002063294 [A] 1,4,9,15,24,27,32,38 * page 963, column R, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - PALACHERLA, "DSP-µP routine computes magnitude", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWSW, NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (19891026), vol. 34, no. 22, pages 225 - 226, XP000070840 [A] 11,12,40,41 * the whole document *