Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977596

EP0977596 - USE OF PAPOVAVIRUS CAPSID PROTEIN FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS TO NEURONAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]USE OF PAPOVAVIRUS CAPSID PROTEIN FOR DELIVERY OF GENETIC MATERIAL
[2003/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RPMS TECHNOLOGY LIMITED
Commonwealth Building, Du Cane Road
London W12 0NN / GB
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GRIFFIN, Beverly, Elayne Royal Postgraduate Med.
School Commonwealth Building Du Cane Road
London W12 0NN / GB
02 / KRAUZEWICZ, Nina, Sheila Royal Postgraduate Med.
School Commonwealth Building Du Cane Road
London W12 0NN / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Thomas, Philip John Duval
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98919321.427.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998GB01230
Priority number, dateGB1997000841526.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708415
GB1997000863229.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708632
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848841
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977596
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977596
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON PAPOVAVIRUS KAPSID-PROTEINEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG THERAPEUTISCHEN AGENTIEN IN NERVZELLEN[2003/22]
English:USE OF PAPOVAVIRUS CAPSID PROTEIN FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS TO NEURONAL CELLS[2003/22]
French:UTILISATION DE PROTEINE CAPSIDIQUES DE PAPOVAVIRUS POUR TRANSFERER DES AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES DANS LES CELLULES NEURONALES[2003/22]
Former [2000/06]VERWENDUNG DES PAPOVAVIRUS KAPSID-PROTEINS ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON GENETICHEM MATERIAL
Former [2000/06]USE OF PAPOVAVIRUS CAPSID PROTEIN FOR DELIVERY OF GENETIC MATERIAL
Former [2000/06]UTILISATION DE LA PROTEINE CAPSIDE DU PAPOVAVIRUS POUR L'APPORT DE MATERIEL GENETIQUE
Entry into regional phase15.11.1999National basic fee paid 
15.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2003Fee for grant paid
07.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH21.01.2004
FR21.01.2004
IT21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
GB27.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]CH21.01.2004
FR21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
GB27.04.2004
Former [2006/12]CH21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
GB27.04.2004
Former [2005/45]CH21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
GB27.04.2004
Former [2005/12]CH21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
Former [2004/44]CH21.01.2004
LI21.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9519368  (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 7, line 21 - line 36 *;
 [PX]WO9717456  (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,7,9-11,15,17,19,22-30 * page 11, line 13 - page 20, line 26 *
 [DA]  - FORSTOVA J ET AL, "POLYOMA VIRUS PSEUDOCAPSIDS AS EFFICIENT CARRIERS OF HETEROLOGOUS DNA INTO MAMMALIAN CELLS", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (199503), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 297 - 306, XP000645479 [DA] 1-30 * page 297 * * abstract *