EP1006882 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE PROGRESS OF LABOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, IE | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRIG Medical Ltd. 16 Sheerit Hapleta St. Haifa 34987 / IL | [2003/03] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Ultra Guide Ltd. 1 Etgar Street, Carmel House Tirat Hakarmel Industrial Park / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paltieli, Yoav 51 Einstein Street Haifa 34602 / IL | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98919447.7 | 04.05.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998IL00208 | Priority number, date | US19970045556P | 05.05.1997 Original published format: US 45556 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849942 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006882 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006882 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/02, A61B5/107, A61B8/08 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/1076 (EP,US);
A61B5/435 (EP,US);
A61B8/0866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | A61B8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ENTWICKLUNG VON WEHEN | [2009/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE PROGRESS OF LABOR | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A CONTROLER L'EVOLUTION DU TRAVAIL PENDANT L'ACCOUCHEMENT | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/24] | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ENTWICKLUNG VON WEHEN | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | GR | 26.02.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | IE | 04.05.2010 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2158767 (FARRE JEAN, et al) [A] 1-3,6,8,22,23,29 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12; table 1 *; | [A]US3768459 (CANNON E, et al) [A] 1,22* abstract *; | [A]DE3103367 (BLUECHER UWE, et al) [A] 1,22 * page 8, line 5 - line 30; table 1 *; | [A]US5438996 (KEMPER W SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8,12,14,16,22,23,27,29,33,35 * column 10, line 29 - line 57 * * column 12, line 14 - line 27 * * column 16, line 66 - column 19, line 5 * * column 21, line 51 - column 22, line 61; tables 3,4,7 * | International search | [A]US5088497 (IKEDA MAKOTO [JP]); | [A]US5222485 (JERATH RAVINDER [US]) | by applicant | FR2158767 | US3768459 | DE3103367 | US4476871 | US4942882 | US5135006 | US5222485 | US5406961 | US5438996 |