Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971311

EP0971311 - MEMORY DEVICE, CONTROLLER AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD.
2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / HIMOTO, Atsunori, Sega Enterprises, Ltd
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
02 / TOSAKI, Kenji, Sega Enterprises, Ltd
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
03 / NAKAYAMA, Madoka, Sega Enterprises, Ltd
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
04 / YASUOKA, Miyuki, Sega Enterprises, Ltd
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
05 / TSUCHIYA, Koji, Sega Enterprises, Ltd
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Smith, Peter James
Serjeants LLP
25 The Crescent
King Street
Leicester LE1 6RX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Smith, Peter James
Serjeants, 25 The Crescent, King Street
Leicester LE1 6RX / GB
Application number, filing date98919570.612.05.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP02097
Priority number, dateJP1997021432208.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21432297
JP1997023587501.09.1997         Original published format: JP 23587597
JP1998005481406.03.1998         Original published format: JP 5481498
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9908231
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971311
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, A63F13/10
[2005/03]
Former International [2000/02]G06K19/07, A63F9/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERMEDIUM, KONTROLLER UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT[2000/02]
English:MEMORY DEVICE, CONTROLLER AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF MEMOIRE, CONTROLEUR ET DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase10.05.1999Translation filed 
10.05.1999National basic fee paid 
10.05.1999Search fee paid 
10.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/22]
09.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
26.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201215   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0684057  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 34-45 *;
 [A]EP0685246  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9512168  (OAKLEIGH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 10, line 16 - line 29 *
International search[X]JPH06259615  (SHARP KK);
 [Y]JPH03278994  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JPH0956927  (OPT KK);
 [Y]JPH08161438  (SONY CORP);
 [X]JPH0525557U  ;
 [Y]JPS62288991  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JPH0343705U