Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980289

EP0980289 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBOXYLIC ACID SALTS AND CATALYSTS USEFUL IN SUCH PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monsanto Technology LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
[2001/29]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MONSANTO COMPANY
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EBNER, Jerry, R.
233 Bentwood Lane
St. Peters, MO 63376 / US
02 / FRANCZYK, Thaddeus, S.
12235 Spring Place Court
Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272
1150 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1
1150 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2000/08]Bosch, Henry A. , et al
Monsanto Services International S.A., Patent Department, Avenue de Tervuren 270/272, Letter Box No. 21
1150 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date98919707.405.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US03189
Priority number, dateUS1997084188805.05.1997         Original published format: US 841888
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850150
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980289
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980289
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/89, B01J37/02
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONSÄURE-SALZE UND KATALYSATOREN VERWENDBAR FÜR SOLCHES VERFAHREN[2000/08]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBOXYLIC ACID SALTS AND CATALYSTS USEFUL IN SUCH PROCESS[2000/08]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SELS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE ET CATALYSEURS DE REALISATION DE CE PROCEDE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase13.11.1999National basic fee paid 
13.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
19.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2003Fee for grant paid
29.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
PT26.04.2004
IE05.05.2004
LU05.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/24]AT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
IE05.05.2004
LU05.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2005/23]AT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
LU05.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2005/11]AT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2004/33]AT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE26.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9601146  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 1-36 *see entire document*;
 [Y]EP0305089  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH06110250  ;
 [A]JPH067679
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940720), vol. 018, no. 387, Database accession no. (P - 1773), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940413), vol. 018, no. 209, Database accession no. (C - 1190), [A] * abstract *
Examination EP0335625