Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980531

EP0980531 - A CELLULAR POSITIONING SYSTEM THAT COMPENSATES FOR RECEIVED SIGNAL DELAYS IN POSITIONING RADIO RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.11.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2002  [2002/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IRVIN, David, R.
1546 Iredell Drive
Raleigh, NC 27608 / US
02 / RAMESH, Rajaram
403 Dantan Drive
Cary, NC 27511 / US
03 / MOLNAR, Karl
110 Flying Leaf Court
Cary, NC 27513 / US
[2000/16]
Former [2000/08]01 / IRVIN, David, R.
3101 Churchill Road
Raleigh, NC 27607 / US
02 / RAMESH, Rajaram
403 Dantan Drive
Cary, NC 27511 / US
03 / MOLNAR, Karl
110 Flying Leaf Court
Cary, NC 27513 / US
Representative(s)O'Connell, David Christopher , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]O'Connell, David Christopher , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98919719.902.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US06276
Priority number, dateUS1997083802722.04.1997         Original published format: US 838027
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848294
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980531
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/06, H04Q7/38
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ZELLULARES POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSSYSTEM MIT KOMPENSATION DER EMPFANGENEN SIGNALVERZÖGERUNGEN IN EINEM FUNKEMPFÄNGER ZUR POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG[2000/08]
English:A CELLULAR POSITIONING SYSTEM THAT COMPENSATES FOR RECEIVED SIGNAL DELAYS IN POSITIONING RADIO RECEIVERS[2000/08]
French:SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT CELLULAIRE COMPENSANT LE RETARD DES SIGNAUX RE US DANS LES RECEPTEURS RADIO DE POSITIONNEMENT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1999National basic fee paid 
17.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
12.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
16.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/51]
16.07.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.07.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5144315  (SCHWAB CARL E [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10,12-19 * column 5, line 31 - column 8, line 32; figures 1,5,6 * [A] 11;
 [XA]US5058200  (HUANG CHIA-CHI [US], et al) [X] 1-6,20,22-26 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 48 * * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 4; figures 3,4,8 * [A] 7,14;
 [XA]US3780370  (REEVES H) [X] 1-6,20,22-26 * column 2, lines 29-57 * * column 3, lines 35-65; claims 1-3,6-12,17,18,29-31 * * figures 1,6,8; claims 34-37 * [A] 6,7,14,21;
 [X]DE4005368  (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [X] 7-9,14-19 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 46; figure 8 *;
 [DA]  - STILP L A, "TIME DIFFERENCE OF ARRIVAL TECHNOLOGY FOR LOCATING NARROWBAND CELLULAR SIGNALS", WIRELESS TECHNOLOGIES AND SERVICES FOR CELLULAR AND PERSONAL COMMUNICATION SERVICES, PHILADELPHIA, USA, (19951025), vol. SPIE 2602, pages 134 - 144, XP002046631 [DA] 1-3,7-9,14-17,20-24 * page 140, lines 20-36 *
 [A]  - MOULY M ET AL, "THE PSEUDO-SYNCHRONISATION, A COSTLESS FEATURE TO OBTAIN THE GAINS OF A SYNCHRONISED CELLULAR NETWORK", MRC MOBILE RADIO CONFERENCE, (19911113), pages 51 - 55, XP000618384 [A] 1,7,14,20
 [A]  - SONG H -L, "AUTOMATIC VEHICLE LOCATION IN CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, (19941101), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 902 - 908, XP000493419 [A] 1,7,14,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.330153