Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976234

EP0976234 - A SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR SWITCHED TELEPHONY COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCI Worldcom, Inc.
515 East Amite Street
Jackson, MS 39201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
MCI Worldcom, Inc.
515 East Amite Street
Jackson, MS 39201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZEY, David, A.
4208 Ragsdale Court
Fuquay-Varina, NC 27526 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Hofmann, Harald , et al
Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]Hofmann, Harald , et al
Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
Former [2000/05]Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98919806.415.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07927
Priority number, dateUS1997083578915.04.1997         Original published format: US 835789
US1997083432015.04.1997         Original published format: US 834320
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847298
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976234
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M7/00, H04Q3/00, H04M3/30
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND HERGESTELLTER GEGENSTAND FÜR FERNSPRECHSCHALTKOMMUNIKATION[2000/05]
English:A SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR SWITCHED TELEPHONY COMMUNICATION[2000/05]
French:SYSTEME PROCEDE ET ARTICLE CON U POUR LES COMMUNICATIONS TELEPHONIQUES PAR RESEAU COMMUTE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
02.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/17]
02.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[LE]WO9823080  (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US], et al) [LE] 1-24 * DOUBTS ABOUT PRIORITY; page 626, line 1 - page 627, line 3 *;
 [PX]EP0802690  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14-18,20-24 * column 2, line 2 - line 13 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 43 *;
 [PX]WO9722211  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-24 * page 44, line 6 - page 47, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0767568  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,9-13,17-21 * page 2, line 37 - column 53 * * abstract *;
 [PA]WO9728628  (LABS OF ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [PA] 1,6-9,14-17,22-24 * abstract * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 22 *;
 [PA]WO9723078  (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [PA] 1,6-9,14-17,22-24 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 27 *;
 [A]US5440620  (SLUSKY RONALD D [US]);
 [A]WO9522221  (HARRIS CORP [US]) [A] 25-28,32-35
 [X]  - LOW C, "THE INTERNET TELEPHONY RED HERRING", HP LABORATORIES TECHNICAL REPORT, (19960515), pages 1 - 15, XP002043901 [X] 1-24 * paragraph [03.0] * * paragraph [06.2] *
 [X]  - LOW C ET AL, "WEBIN - AN ARCHITECTURE FOR FAST DEPLOYMENT OF IN-BASED PERSONAL SERVICES", WORKSHOP RECORD. INTELLIGENT NETWORK. FREEDOM AND FLEXIBILITY: REALISING THE PROMISE OF INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICES, (19960421), pages 1 - 12, XP002043670 [X] 1-24 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - PLAMEN L. SIMEONOV ET AL, "INGATE: A DISTRIBUTED INTELLIGENT NETWORK APPROACH TO BRIDGE SWITCHING AND PACKET NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, LAS VEGAS (US), (19970922), pages 358 - 363, XP002073675 [PX] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14-18,20-25,32 * paragraph [II.C]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [II.D] * * paragraph [IV.B] * * paragraph [IV.A] *
 [PA]  - L.GYS ET AL, "INTELLIGENCE IN THE NETWORK", ALCATEL TELECOMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, PARIS (FR), (1998), no. 1, pages 13 - 22, XP000736507