Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017440

EP1017440 - METHOD OF DELIVERING HALOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VINOGRADOV, Valentin, Antonovich
Apartment 38, Khoroshevskoye Shosse, 34
Moscow, 123007 / RU
02 / DIRKSING, Robert, Stanley
7188 Wyandotte Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45233 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane, Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Lovett House Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date98919902.129.04.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998US08372
Priority number, dateUS1997084113229.04.1997         Original published format: US 841132
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848875
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017440
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00, A61K33/14
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HALOTHERAPEUTISCHEN BEHANDLUNG[2000/28]
English:METHOD OF DELIVERING HALOTHERAPY[2000/28]
French:PROCEDE APPLICABLE A L'ADMINISTRATION DE TRAITEMENT HALOTHERAPEUTIQUE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/21]
13.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9311746  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8,10-12;
 [E]US5747002  (CLARK ANDREW REGINALD [US], et al) [E] 1,2,6,7,11,12;
 [A]WO9522993  (CENT SYDNEY AREA HEALTH SERV [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,7,10-12;
 [A]US5215221  (DIRKSING ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1,6,7,11
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [A] 7,12