blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0979260


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
19.07.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
28.07.2001 (Expected) grant published on  12.09.2001 [2001/37]
29.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.04.2001 Renewal fee
14.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
14.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.01.2001 First examination report
11.01.2001 Communication of intention to grant
08.12.2000 Change - representative published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
17.11.2000 Change - applicant published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
28.06.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
14.06.2000 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
03.03.2000 Change - inventor published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
30.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.02.2000 [2000/07]
30.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  16.02.2000 [2000/07]
29.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication