blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0979260

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure18.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase01.12.1999National basic fee paid 
01.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2000
European patent granted12.09.2001
Opposition procedure13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.09.2002 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:16.02.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991201
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:LEVINESS, STEPHEN, C.
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MITCHELL, WILLARD, N.
 
Event date:03.01.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
 
Event date:28.02.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010116
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:18.10.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69801657
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20011018
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:15.02.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20030514
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:30.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:31.10.2004 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20080317
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20080430
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20080416
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20080325
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080403
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.12.2009 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20090429
 
Event date:04.01.2010 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20091101
 
Event date:22.01.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20091231
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091103
 
Event date:26.02.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091101
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091222
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090429
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090429