Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979260

EP0979260 - SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS WITH CYCLIC CO PURGE AND CATALYST REJUVENATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEVINESS, Stephen, C.
6704 East 102 Street
Tulsa, Oklahoma 74133 / US
02 / MITCHELL, Willard, N.
156 Summers Bay Drive
Ridgeland, MS 39157 / US
[2000/16]
Former [2000/07]01 / LEVINESS, Stephen, C.
1850 Cloverdale Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US
02 / MITCHELL, Willard, N.
156 Summers Bay Drive
Ridgeland, MS 39157 / US
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [2000/07]Somers, Harold Arnold , et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date98920073.829.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08790
Priority number, dateUS1997085056502.05.1997         Original published format: US 850565
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850491
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979260
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979260
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C10G2/00, C07C1/04
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:SLURRYKOHLENWASSERSTOFFSYNTHESE MIT CYKLISCHER ABFÜHRUNG VON CO UND KATALYSATORWIEDERBELEBUNG[2000/07]
English:SLURRY HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS WITH CYCLIC CO PURGE AND CATALYST REJUVENATION[2000/07]
French:SYNTHESE DE BOUES D'HYDROCARBURES A PURGE CYCLIQUE DU CO ET REGENERATION DU CATALYSEUR[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase01.12.1999National basic fee paid 
01.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
16.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2001Fee for grant paid
18.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO9717137  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [AP] 1,2,7,10 * claims 1,4 * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0533228  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,5,7,8 * claims 1,5,6 * * page 3, line 55 - line 56 * * page 4, line 10 - line 21 *