Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975359

EP0975359 - USE OF COMPOUNDS BINDING A CYTOPLASMIC DIPEPTIDASE FOR THE POTENTIATION OF THE IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]POTENTIATION OF THE IMMUNE RESPONSE THROUGH DELIVERY OF COMPOUNDS BINDING A CYTOPLASMIC DIPEPTIDASE
[2001/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE
4th Floor, Ballou Hall
Medford, MA 02155 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE
4th Floor, Ballou Hall
Medford, MA 02155 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE
Blue Hall, 4th Floor
Medford, Massachusetts 02155 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUBER, Brigitte, T.
175 Grove Street
Cambridge, MA 02111 / US
02 / SCHMITZ, Tracy
5521 15th Avenue NE, Apt. 1
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
03 / UNDERWOOD, Robert
50 Phillips Street
Quincy, MA 02170 / US
[2000/21]
Former [2000/20]01 / HUBER, Brigitte, T.
175 Grove Street
Cambridge, MA 02111 / US
02 / SCHMITZ, Tracy
5521 15th Avenue NE, Apt. 1
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
03 / UNDERWOOD, Robert
93 Walker Street
Quincy, MA 02171 / US
Former [2000/05]01 / HUBER, Brigitte, T.
175 Grove Street
Cambridge, MA 02111 / US
02 / SCHMITZ, Tracy
475 Huron Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
03 / UNDERWOOD, Robert
93 Walker Street
Quincy, MA 02171 / US
Representative(s)Schlich, George , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Schlich, George William , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98920101.730.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US08838
Priority number, dateUS1997085239507.05.1997         Original published format: US 852395
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850066
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975359
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975359
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/55, G01N33/50, A61P37/04
[2001/35]
Former International [2000/05]A61K38/55, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN DIE AN EIN ZYTOPLASMATISCHEN DIPEPTIDASE BINDEN ZUR POTENZIERUNG DES IMMUNANTWORTS[2001/35]
English:USE OF COMPOUNDS BINDING A CYTOPLASMIC DIPEPTIDASE FOR THE POTENTIATION OF THE IMMUNE RESPONSE[2001/35]
French:UTILISATION DE COMPOSES SE FIXANT A UNE DIPEPTIDASE CYTOPLASMIQUE POUR POTENTIALISER LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE[2001/35]
Former [2000/05]POTENZIERUNG DES IMMUNANTWORTS DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN DIE AN EIN ZYTOPLASMATISCHEN DIPEPTIDASE BINDEN
Former [2000/05]POTENTIATION OF THE IMMUNE RESPONSE THROUGH DELIVERY OF COMPOUNDS BINDING A CYTOPLASMIC DIPEPTIDASE
Former [2000/05]POTENTIALISATION DE LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE PAR PRODUCTION DE COMPOSES SE FIXANT A UNE DIPEPTIDASE CYTOPLASMIQUE
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
15.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
03.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2003Fee for grant paid
24.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Former [2007/17]LU30.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9403055  (US HEALTH [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 27 * * page 8 - page 9; example 4 *;
 [A]WO9117767  (NEW ENGLAND MEDICAL CENTER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 1, line 16 - page 3, line 11 *;
 [A]  - FLENTKE ET AL, "INHIBITION OF DIPEPTIDYL AMINOPEPTIDASE IV (DP-IV) BY XAA-BOROPRO DIPEPTIDES AND USE OF THESE INHIBITORS TO EXAMINE THE ROLE OF DP-IV IN T-CELL FUNCTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1556 - 1559, XP000578025 [A] 1-19 * page 1556 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.4.1556
ExaminationUS4935493
 WO9529691
 WO9308259