Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990190

EP0990190 - EYESIGHT PROTECTION APPARATUS WITH ATTACHED EARPLUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Radians, Inc.
Suite 113, 6399 Shelby View Drive
Memphis, TN 38174-7661 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / BRIGHT, Aaron, Lee
1551 Jackson Avenue
Memphis, TN 38107 / US
02 / GREEN, Robert, W.
6076 Maiden Lane
Memphis, TN 38120 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/14]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig, Büro Berlin-Adlershof Rudower Chaussee 29
12489 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98920191.804.05.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US09044
Priority number, dateUS1997087043306.06.1997         Original published format: US 870433
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855894
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990190
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02C5/14, G02C5/16, G02C1/00, G02C11/06
[2000/40]
Former International [2000/14]G02C5/14, G02C5/16, G02C1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:AUGENSCHUTZGERÄT MIT DARAN BEFESTIGTEN OHRENSTÖPSELN[2000/14]
English:EYESIGHT PROTECTION APPARATUS WITH ATTACHED EARPLUGS[2000/14]
French:APPAREIL DE PROTECTION DE LA VUE AVEC BOUCHE-OREILLES CONNEXES[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Search fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
30.11.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
16.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/18]
22.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PA]US5703670  (CALLARD SHAWN R [US]) [PA] 1,4,5,10 * column 1 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [A]US5133596  (KORNY LINDSAY M [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,7,10 * column 2, line 1 - line 60 *;
 [A]US5619750  (ALLEWALT DONALD L [US]) [A] 1,3,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [A]US5278999  (BROWN RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1,6,10 * claim - *;
 [DA]US5541677  (HUHTALA KEITH [US]) [DA] 1,6,10 * claim - *
International search[X]US4632104  (CONROW ROBERT P [US]);
 [Y]US5475449  (PYLE NIGEL [US])