Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980630

EP0980630 - APPLICATION PROGRAMMING INTERFACE FOR INTELLIGENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Openwave Systems Inc.
1400 Seaport Boulevard
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2003/23]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Global Mobility Systems, Inc.
Suite 110, 11201 S.E. 8th Street
Bellevue, WA 98004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOSSMAN, William, E.
1984 Magnolia Boulevard West
Seattle, WA 98199 / US
02 / HARTMAIER, Peter, J.
12501-197th Court N.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/08]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98920318.706.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US09306
Priority number, dateUS1997085295108.05.1997         Original published format: US 852951
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9851097
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980630
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04Q7/24
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMMIERUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR INTELLIGENTES NETZWERK[2000/08]
English:APPLICATION PROGRAMMING INTERFACE FOR INTELLIGENT NETWORK[2000/08]
French:INTERFACE DE PROGRAMMATION D'APPLICATIONS POUR RESEAU INTELLIGENT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1999National basic fee paid 
08.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.02.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/45]
08.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/21]
07.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9526114  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 20 * * page 20, line 6 - line 14 *;
 [A]WO9613949  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 3, line 27 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 22 - line 25 *;
 [A]WO9318606  (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5602991  (BERTEAU C DONALD [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SEVCIK M ET AL, "CUSTOMERS IN DRIVER'S SEAT: PRIVATE INTELLIGENT NETWORK CONTROL POINT", ISS '95. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHIN SYMPOSIUM), ADVANCED SWITCHING TECHNOLOGIES FOR UNIVERSAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS AT THE BEGINNING OF THE 21ST. CENTURY BERLIN, APR. 23 - 28, 1995, VERBAND DEUTSCHER ELEKTROTECHNIKER (VDE) ET AL, (19950423), vol. 2, no. SYMP. 15, pages 41 - 44, XP000495622 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - RAMARAO B C V, "ROLE OF APPLICATION GATEWAYS IN A GLOBAL INTELLIGENT NETWORK", INTELLIGENT NETWORKS: THE PATH TO GLOBAL NETWORKING, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL FOR COMPUTER COMMUNICATION INTELLIGENT NETWORKS CONFERENCE, TAMPA, MAY 4 - 6, 1992, BAYLISS P W (ED ), (19920504), pages 358 - 367, XP000684031 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *