Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981716

EP0981716 - FIREARM EQUIPPED WITH A QUICK SAFETY DEVICE AND SAFETY DEVICE KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.D.I.H. Sprl
rue de Visé, 338
4020 Jupille-Sur-Meuse / BE
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBERT, Léon
338, rue de Visé
B-4020 Jupille-sur-Meuse / BE
02 / HUBERT, Robert
338, rue du Doyard
B-4010 Herstal / BE
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Michel , et al
Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière
4000 Liège / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Van Malderen, Michel , et al
Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière
4000 Liège / BE
Application number, filing date98920412.814.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998BE00069
Priority number, dateBE1997000042715.05.1997         Original published format: BE 9700427
[2000/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9851984
Date:19.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981716
Date:01.03.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981716
Date:17.09.2003
Language:FR
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:F41A17/74, F41A17/56
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/09]
TitleGerman:FEUERWAFFE MIT SCHNELLWIRKENDER SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BAUSATZ FÜR EINE SOLCHE SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2000/09]
English:FIREARM EQUIPPED WITH A QUICK SAFETY DEVICE AND SAFETY DEVICE KIT[2000/09]
French:ARME A FEU MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE RAPIDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE EN KIT[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
14.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2003Fee for grant paid
17.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.05.2004
[2005/45]
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4312263  (BOURLET MAURICE V) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 25 - line 42; figures 1-5 * [A] 7;
 [XA]US5166458  (YOO DAE-SOON [KR]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 30 - line 65; figures 2-7 * [A] 3-7;
 [PXA]EP0801285  (DAEWOO PRECISION IND LTD [KR]) [PX] 1,2 * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 45; figures 2-8 * [A] 3-7;
 [X]DE153961  (MÜLLER) [X] 1,5 * page 2, column L, line 10 - line 33; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4628626  (BRANDT RAYMOND W [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 64; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US4926575  (PASTOR WALTER [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 41; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US4461110  (INDERBITZEN DANIEL T [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 14; figures 2-8 *;
 [A]EP0550238  (TAAS ISRAEL IND LTD [IL]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 9 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5208406  (BADALI JOSEPH A [US]);
 [A]GB2137324  (SMITH DAVID EDWARD)
by applicantUS5208406
 US4312263
 US5166458
 EP0801285