blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970299

EP0970299 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSP Innovative Automotive Systems GmbH
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LEIBER, Heinz, Karl
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
D-71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Lenzing, Andreas
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
40103 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr.
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98920484.724.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01706
Priority number, dateDE199711205424.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712054
DE199714156920.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19741569
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842956
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970299
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970299
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:F01L9/04, F02P15/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
F02P3/02 (EP); F01L9/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2000/02]
English:INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2000/02]
French:MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1999National basic fee paid 
31.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
30.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2000Fee for grant paid
08.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB20.06.2001
SE20.09.2001
[2002/16]
Former [2002/05]SE20.09.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2343905  (DAIMLER BENZ AG);
 [A]FR2307958  (ROBERT EDMOND [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1471537  (VENARD R) [A] 1 * page 4, line 66 - line 79; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO8700239  (FLECK ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 10 - line 29; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE7003143U
 EP0357938
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.