Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977757

EP0977757 - 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 4.2.1.1?2,5 ]DECANE AND 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 3.3.1.1?2,6 ]DECANE DERIVATIVES HAVING ANALGESIC ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neuroscienze S.C.A.R.L.
Via palabanda, 9
09125 Cagliari / IT
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / CIGNARELLA, Giorgio Univ. Degli Studi di Milano
Istituto di Chim. Farm. e Tos. Viale Abruzzi, 42
20131 Milano / IT
02 / VIANELLO, Paola Univ. Degli Studi di Milano
Istituto di Chim. Farm. e Tos. Viale Abruzzi, 42
20131 Milano / IT
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr.
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98920536.417.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP02252
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0093822.04.1997         Original published format: IT MI970938
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847902
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977757
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977757
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/18, C07D471/18, A61K31/495, // (C07D487/18, 241:00, 209:00, 209:00),(C07D471/18, 241:00, 221:00, 221:00)
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesAL03.11.1999
SI03.11.1999
TitleGerman:9,10-DIAZATRYCLO[4.2.11 2,5]DECAN- UND 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO[3.3.1.1 2,6]DECANDERIVE MIT ANALGETISCHER WIRKUNG[2000/06]
English:9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 4.2.1.1?2,5 ]DECANE AND 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 3.3.1.1?2,6 ]DECANE DERIVATIVES HAVING ANALGESIC ACTIVITY[2000/06]
French:DERIVES DE 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 4.2.1.1?2,5 ]DECANE ET 9,10-DIAZATRICYCLO 3.3.1.1?2,6 ]DECANE PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE ANALGESIQUE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
05.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2003Fee for grant paid
11.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
IT15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
PT15.03.2004
LU17.04.2004
IE19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
LU17.04.2004
IE19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2005/24]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
LU17.04.2004
IE19.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2005/23]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
LU17.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2005/02]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2004/52]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
Former [2004/46]AT15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
ES26.01.2004
Former [2004/41]AT15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI15.10.2003
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE15.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9523152  (RIACE ETS [LI], et al) [DA] 1,6,7 * claims 1,10 *