blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0973683 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0973683



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 97
30.12.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.01.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.10.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
28.07.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
30.01.2001 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.08.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.09.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.09.1999 Annex Search / examination 18
13.09.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.09.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 16
05.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
05.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 15