Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0973683
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001518864Global Dossier 16.10.2001A
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0973683Global Dossier 20.02.2002B1
EP0973683 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT213484T 15.03.2002T
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU737476B 23.08.2001B2
AU7340198 30.10.1998A
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9807923 22.02.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2284875 01.07.2003C
CA2284875 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69803921T 16.01.2003T2
DE69803921D 28.03.2002D1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6257805 10.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
FR9800716 08.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845196Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1097012C 25.12.2002C
CN1252036 03.05.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2761671 11.06.1999B1
FR2761671 09.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100339058B 31.05.2002B1
KR20010005587 15.01.2001A
Priority number Date
FR9704514 08.04.1997