Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973683

EP0973683 - SWITCHING DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR SYSTEM INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIDEL Société anonyme
Avenue de la Patrouille de France
76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / BERNARD, Frédéric
2, rue Jules Guesde
F-59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
96/98, Boulevard Carnot
B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Duthoit, Michel
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105
59027 Lille Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98920594.308.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FR00716
Priority number, dateFR1997000451408.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704514
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845196
Date:15.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973683
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973683
Date:20.02.2002
Language:FR
[2002/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65G51/03
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:WEICHENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE TRANSPORTANLAGE FÜR GEGENSTÄNDEN[2000/04]
English:SWITCHING DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR SYSTEM INSTALLATION[2000/04]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AIGUILLAGE POUR INSTALLATION DE TRANSPORT D'OBJECTS[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2001Fee for grant paid
27.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
IE20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
LU08.04.2002
MC08.04.2002
BE30.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
[2004/43]
Former [2004/39]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
LU08.04.2002
MC08.04.2002
BE30.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2004/10]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
MC08.04.2002
BE30.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2004/04]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
MC08.04.2002
BE30.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2003/48]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
MC08.04.2002
BE30.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/46]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
MC08.04.2002
DK20.05.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/25]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
MC08.04.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/19]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
GR20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/09]AT20.02.2002
FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/06]FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
NL20.02.2002
PT20.05.2002
Former [2003/01]FI20.02.2002
GB20.02.2002
Former [2002/49]FI20.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0649804  (NEU TRANS SYSTEM SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5100265  (MIRKIN VADIM [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR886656  (LAMSON ETS) [A] 1 * figures 8-11 *