Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979155

EP0979155 - CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[2003/25]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SJÖDEN, Johan
Urbergsterrassen 40 3tr.
S-802 62 Gävle / SE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Taquist, Lennart
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date98920788.127.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998SE00765
Priority number, dateSE1997000160328.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701603
[2000/07]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848963
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979155
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979155
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B23B27/10, B23B29/12
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/07]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDWERKZEUG[2000/07]
English:CUTTING TOOL[2000/07]
French:OUTIL DE COUPE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1998Translation filed 
07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
11.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2003Fee for grant paid
05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9014913  (KENNAMETAL INC [US]);
 [A]US5340242  (ARMBRUST WILLIAM D [US], et al);
 [A]US4695208  (YANKOFF GERALD K [US]);
 [A]US5148728  (MAZURKIEWICZ MARIAN [US])