blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968299

EP0968299 - RAPID PRODUCTION OF AUTOLOGOUS TUMOR VACCINES BY USING HSV AMPLICON VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sloan-Kettering Institute for Cancer Research
1275 York Avenue
New York
New York 10021 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF ROCHESTER
Office of Technology Transfer, 518 Hylan Building
Rochester, NY 14627-0140 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Sloan-Kettering Institute For Cancer Research
1275 York Avenue
New York, New York 10021 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF ROCHESTER
Office of Technology Transfer, 518 Hylan Building
Rochester, NY 14627-0140 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FONG, Yuman, Office of Industrial Affairs
Mem. Sloan Kettering Cancer Cnt. 1275 York Ave.
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / FEDEROFF, Howard
66 Whitewood Lane
Rochester, NY 14618 / US
03 / ROSENBLATT, Joseph, D., Uni. of Rochester
Box 3704 601 Elmwood Avenue
Rochester, NY 14642 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Davies, Gregory Mark, et al
Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Davies, Gregory Mark, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales
Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Former [2000/01]Austin, Hedley William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date98920820.220.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US05505
Priority number, dateUS19970044005P21.03.1997         Original published format: US 44005 P
[2000/06]
Former [2000/01]US19970004400P21.03.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842855
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968299
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/86, A61K39/00, A61K48/00
[2000/01]
CPC:
C12N15/86 (EP,US); A61K39/0011 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP); A61K2039/5156 (EP,US); A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US); C12N2710/16643 (EP,US); C12N2830/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/60 (EP,US); C12N2840/203 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG AUTOLOGER KREBSIMPFSTOFFE DURCH VERWENDUNG VON HSV AMPLICON VEKTOREN[2000/01]
English:RAPID PRODUCTION OF AUTOLOGOUS TUMOR VACCINES BY USING HSV AMPLICON VECTORS[2000/01]
French:PRODUCTION RAPIDE DE VACCINS ANTITUMORAUX AUTOLOGUES AU MOYEN DE VECTEURS AMPLICONS DU VIRUS DE L'HERPEX SIMPLEX[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
13.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9629421  (CANTAB PHARMA RES [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9,14,15,17,22,36,38-40 * page 3, line 37 - page 6, line 16 * * page 16, line 2 - page 19, line 11 * * page 24, line 22 - page 25, line 17 * * page 26, line 2 - page 28, line 15 * * page 34, line 31 - page 35, line 21 * [A] ;
 [A]WO9700085  (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US]) [A] 36 * page 5, line 2 - line 16 *;
 [A]  - TUNG ET AL, "RAPID PRODUCTION OF INTERLEUKIN-2-SECRETING TUMOR CELLS BY HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS-MEDIATED GENE TRANSFER: IMPLICATIONS FOR AUTOLOGOUS VACCINE PRODUCTION", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 2217 - 2224, XP002073449 [A] 1-40 * page 2217 * * abstract *
 [PX]  - KUTUBUDDIN ET AL, "ERADICATION OF PREEXISTING MURINE TUMOR USING HERPES AMPLICON VECTORS", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (199711), vol. 4, no. 6, page S26, XP002073450 [PX] 1-7,10,11,14-16,20-24,26,27,30,31,33,36-40 * see abstact P-53 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.