Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995230

EP0995230 - CURRENT CONDUCTING END PLATE OF FUEL CELL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plug Power, Inc.
968 Albany-Shaker Road
Latham, NY 12110 / US
[2000/19]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Plug Power, L.L.C.
968 Albany-Shaker Road
Latham, NY 12110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALSH, Michael, M.
655 Beach Road
Fairfield, CT 06430 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98920853.321.04.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US07803
Priority number, dateUS1997088445227.06.1997         Original published format: US 884452
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900862
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995230
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/24, H01M8/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:STROMLEITENDE ENDPLATTE FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLENANORDNUNG[2000/17]
English:CURRENT CONDUCTING END PLATE OF FUEL CELL ASSEMBLY[2000/17]
French:PLAQUE D'EXTREMITE CONDUISANT LE COURANT D'UN ENSEMBLE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
20.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
06.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1358243  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-17,19,20 * page 2, line 20 - line 39 * * page 3, line 66 - line 92 * * figure 1; claims 1,12 *;
 [XA]US4948681  (ZAGRODNIK JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13,19 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 65; figures 1,6-8 * * column 6, line 19 - line 27 * [A] 6-8;
 [X]JPS63108678  ;
 [X]JPS5998473  ;
 [A]WO9618217  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,14,18 * page 21, line 6 - page 22, line 11; figure 7; claims 8,9,12,15 *;
 [A]JPH02281567  ;
 [A]EP0198483  (IVAC CORP [US]) [A] 1,14 * figures 4-6; claims 9,14 * * claim 1 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, column 5 * * page 8, column 33 - page 9, column 3 *;
 [A]US4175165  (ADLHART OTTO J [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 59 - line 65; figures 1,14 *;
 [A]EP0143300  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * page 7, line 5 - line 9 *;
 [A]US3717505  (UNKLE T, et al) [A] 1,14 * column 5, line 14 - line 20; figures 2,3A * * column 1, line 7 - line 12 *;
 [A]GB2085475  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 6,7,15,19 * page 2, line 9 - line 33; figure 2 * * page 2, line 62 - line 79; claim 1 * * page 1, line 79 - line 82 * * page 1, line 120 - line 126 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880920), vol. 012, no. 351, Database accession no. (E - 660), & JP63108678 A 19880513 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840928), vol. 008, no. 213, Database accession no. (E - 269), & JP59098473 A 19840606 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN;OTHERS: 0J) [X] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910206), vol. 015, no. 050, Database accession no. (E - 1030), & JP02281567 A 19901119 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract *