Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979311

EP0979311 - IN VIVO USE OF RECOMBINAGENIC OLIGONUCLEOBASES TO CORRECT GENETIC LESIONS IN HEPATOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/07]$i(IN VIVO) USE OF RECOMBINAGENIC OLIGONUCLEOBASES TO CORRECT GENETIC LESIONS IN HEPATOCYTES
[2000/30]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA
Suite 201
1100 Washington Avenue South
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55415-1226 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA
Suite 201, 1100 Washington Avenue South
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55415-1226 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA
1100 Washington Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55415-1226 / US
02 / STEER, Clifford, J.
1924 Pinehurst Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55116-1339 / US
03 / KREN, Betsy, T.
810 29th Avenue S.
Minneapolis, MN 55454 / US
04 / BANDYOPADHYAY, Paramita, T.
1062B 27th Avenue S.E.
Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date98920930.930.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US08834
Priority number, dateUS19970045288P30.04.1997         Original published format: US 45288 P
US19970054837P05.08.1997         Original published format: US 54837 P
US19970064996P10.11.1997         Original published format: US 64996 P
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849350
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979311
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, A61K48/00, C07H21/04
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:IN VIVO VERWENDUNG REKOMBINAGENISCHER OLIGONUKLEOBASEN ZUR KORREKTUR GENETISCHER DEFEKTE IN HEPATOZYTEN[2000/30]
English:IN VIVO USE OF RECOMBINAGENIC OLIGONUCLEOBASES TO CORRECT GENETIC LESIONS IN HEPATOCYTES[2000/30]
French:UTILISATION IN VIVO D'OLIGONUCLEOBASES RECOMBINAGENES POUR CORRIGER LES LESIONS GENETIQUES DES HEPATOCYTES[2000/30]
Former [2000/07]$i(IN VIVO)VERWENDUNG REKOMBINAGENISCHER OLIGONUKLEOBASEN ZUR KORREKTUR GENETISCHER DEFEKTE IN HEPATOZYTEN
Former [2000/07]$i(IN VIVO) USE OF RECOMBINAGENIC OLIGONUCLEOBASES TO CORRECT GENETIC LESIONS IN HEPATOCYTES
Former [2000/07]UTILISATION $i(IN VIVO) D'OLIGONUCLEOBASES RECOMBINAGENES POUR CORRIGER LES LESIONS GENETIQUES DES HEPATOCYTES
Entry into regional phase19.11.1999National basic fee paid 
19.11.1999Search fee paid 
19.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/21]
17.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9412650  (TRANSKARYOTIC THERAPIES INC [US]);
 [Y]WO9404032  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]);
 [Y]US5264618  (FELGNER PHILIP L [US], et al)
 [Y]  - CAPECCHI M. R., "ALTERING THE GENOME BY HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19890616), vol. 244., doi:10.1126/science.2660260, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1288 - 1292., XP002910193

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2660260