Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981521

EP0981521 - NOVEL MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company
PO Box 4000
Princeton, New Jersey 08443-4000 / US
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
Dupont Pharmaceuticals Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Del.19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XUE, Chu-Bio
11 Rivendell Court
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
02 / DECICCO, Carl, P.
17 Ridgewood Turn
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / CHERNEY, Robert, J.
104 Bridleshire Court
Newark, DE 19711 / US
04 / ARNER, Elizabeth
386 South Jennersville Road
West Grove, PA 19390 / US
05 / DEGRADO, William, F.
502 Bancroft Road
Moylan, PA 19065 / US
06 / DUAN, Jingwu
17 Springbrook Lane
Newark, DE 19711 / US
07 / HE, Xiaohua
12 Old Flint Circle
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
08 / JACOBSON, Irina, Cipora
3205 Heathwood Road, Wilmington
Delaware, 19810-3427 / US
09 / MAGOLDA, Ronald, L.
3 Church Drive
Wallington, PA 19086 / US
10 / NELSON, David
40 Tiverton Circle
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2000/15]
Former [2000/09]01 / XUE, Chu-Bio
11 Rivendell Court
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
02 / DECICCO, Carl, P.
17 Ridgewood Turn
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / CHERNEY, Robert, J.
104 Bridleshire Court
Newark, DE 19711 / US
04 / ARNER, Elizabeth
386 South Jennersville Road
West Grove, PA 19390 / US
05 / DEGRADO, William, F.
502 Bancroft Road
Moylan, PA 19065 / US
06 / DUAN, Jingwu
17 Springbrook Lane
Newark, DE 19711 / US
07 / HE, Xiaohua
12 Old Flint Circle
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
08 / JACOBSON, Irina, Cipora
3360 Chichester Avenue
Boothwyn, PA 10961 / US
09 / MAGOLDA, Ronald, L.
3 Church Drive
Wallington, PA 19086 / US
10 / NELSON, David
40 Tiverton Circle
Newark, DE 19711 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2003/17]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/09]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98921183.414.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US09789
Priority number, dateUS1997085622314.05.1997         Original published format: US 856223
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9851665
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981521
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981521
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D273/02, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D413/14, A61K31/395, C12Q1/37
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/09]
TitleGerman:MACROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS METALLPROTEASEINHIBITOREN[2000/09]
English:NOVEL MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS[2000/09]
French:NOUVEAUX COMPOSES MACROCYCLIQUES COMME INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEASE[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
30.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2002Fee for grant paid
22.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
GB14.05.2003
IE14.05.2003
LU14.05.2003
ES16.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
GB14.05.2003
IE14.05.2003
LU14.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
GB14.05.2003
IE14.05.2003
Former [2004/22]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
GB14.05.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/51]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE11.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9213831  (BRITISH BIO TECHNOLOGY [GB]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9718207  (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [PX] 1-6 * see the whole document, particularly claim 9, formula IVd, page 59, third compound, page 195, examples 2930 and 2931, and page 275, table 32 *
 [A]  - KSANDER G M ET AL., "Ortho-substituted benzofused macrocyclic lactams as zinc metalloprotease inhibitors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Washington DC, US, (19970214), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 495 - 505, XP002074845 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960582o