blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0981469 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0981469



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 176
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.11.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.11.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.10.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.07.2003 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 15
27.06.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Description Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.03.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
08.08.2002 Description Search / examination 5
08.08.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.08.2002 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.08.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 14
05.04.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.04.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
13.03.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.03.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.04.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
19.01.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 26
30.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14
10.11.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.11.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28