blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0981469


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.11.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
14.11.2003 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.2004  [2004/01]
16.10.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.10.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.07.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.07.2003 New entry: Subsequent approval following communication of intention to grant
19.06.2003 Examination report or reply
23.05.2003 Renewal fee
27.02.2003 Examination report or reply
14.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant
28.05.2002 Renewal fee
05.04.2002 First examination report
03.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
22.05.2001 Renewal fee
23.05.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Supplementary search report published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
14.01.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.03.2000 [2000/09]
14.01.2000 Request for examination filed published on  01.03.2000 [2000/09]
03.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication