blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0981469
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3998727BGlobal Dossier 31.10.2007B2
JP2001525756 11.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
US9809845 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0981469Global Dossier 02.01.2004B1
EP0981469 26.04.2000A4
EP0981469 01.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
US9809845 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2285963 19.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
US9809845 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69820869T 09.06.2004T2
DE69820869D 05.02.2004D1
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
US9809845 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100529645B 17.11.2005B1
KR20010020419 15.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
US9809845 12.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9851547Global Dossier 19.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6260879 17.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
US7558298 11.05.1998
US4616897 12.05.1997