Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981469

EP0981469 - AIR BAG SUPPRESSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LABORATORY, INC.
27200 Haggerty Road, Suite B-12 Farmington Hills
Michigan 48331 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LABORATORY INC.
27200 Haggerty Road Suite B-12
Farmington Hills Michigan 48331 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STANLEY, James, Gregory
21945 Daleview
Novi, MI 48374 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98921202.212.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US09845
Priority number, dateUS19970046168P12.05.1997         Original published format: US 46168 P
US1998007558211.05.1998         Original published format: US 75582
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851547
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981469
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981469
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/32
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/09]
TitleGerman:LUFTSACKSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2000/09]
English:AIR BAG SUPPRESSION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2000/09]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE COUSSINS GONFLABLES DE SECURITE[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Search fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
05.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2003Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2003Fee for grant paid
06.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4112579  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 12 - line 26 * * column 7, line 11 - line 23 * * column 13, line 22 - line 33 * * column 12, line 14 - line 24 * * figures 1,10,11,13 *;
 [A]WO9701458  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 20 - line 30 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9710115  (IEE SARL [LU], et al) [A] 1,4,8,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 23 * * page 2, line 13 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19519130  (PARS PASSIVE RUECKHALTESYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 46 - line 65 * * column 6, line 19 - line 24 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]US5413378
 [Y]US5525843
 [Y]US4021057
 [Y]US5232243
 [Y]US5454591
 [Y]US5474327