blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991666 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991666



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 193
01.10.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
12.10.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
06.07.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.07.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
06.07.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
12.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
12.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
12.03.2007 Description Search / examination 2
12.03.2007 Description Search / examination 2
12.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 12
07.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.09.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
21.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
21.09.2004 Description Search / examination 2
21.09.2004 Description Search / examination 1
21.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
23.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Description Search / examination 2
24.12.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
21.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Description Search / examination 2
21.12.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
22.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
13.10.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
04.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
08.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
08.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 23