blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991666


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]
01.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.02.2010  [2010/05]
20.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
19.12.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2009  [2009/04]
03.10.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
26.10.2007 (Expected) grant published on  28.11.2007  [2007/48]
26.10.2007 Change - inventor published on  28.11.2007  [2007/48]
20.10.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.10.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.07.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.01.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.09.2006 First examination report
05.09.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.03.2004 First examination report
12.03.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.06.2003 Renewal fee
04.06.2002 Renewal fee
16.05.2001 Renewal fee
16.05.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 Change - extension states
11.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication