blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991666
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002510294Global Dossier 02.04.2002A
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991666Global Dossier 28.11.2007B1
EP0991666 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU729389B 01.02.2001B2
AU7418098 30.12.1998A
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9810002 01.08.2000A
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2293806 09.02.2010C
CA2293806 17.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59814132D 10.01.2008D1
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0991666T 14.04.2008T3
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO995928L 09.02.2000L
NO995928D 03.12.1999D0
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK171699 12.06.2000A3
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6974792 13.12.2005B2
US2002082214 27.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
AT9800130 20.05.1998
US96334101 24.09.2001
US44559000 13.03.2000
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9856821Global Dossier 17.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT407114B 27.12.2000B
ATA100797 15.05.2000A
Priority number Date
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2296334T 16.04.2008T3
Priority number Date
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HU0003712 28.02.2001A2
Priority number Date
AT100797 10.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT991666E 27.12.2007E
Priority number Date
AT100797 10.06.1997