blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0991666

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
CYLapse: 28.11.2007
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 29.02.2008
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 20.05.2008
 MCLapse: 31.05.2008
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure12.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted28.11.2007
Opposition procedure29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit published on 05.11.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 19991224
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991224
 
Event date:06.05.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040317
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040317
 
Event date:28.11.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:28.11.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:SI
 
Event date:28.11.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:21.12.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:27.12.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20071214
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:KIRKER & CIE S.A.
 
Event date:10.01.2008 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59814132
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20080110
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.01.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:05.03.2008 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20080213
 
Event date:14.04.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:16.04.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2296334 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:11.07.2008 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20080829
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080531
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080229
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20071128
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080520
 
Event date:03.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59814132 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE
 
Event date:03.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59814132 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED, BANNOCKBURN, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER AG, WIEN, AT
 
Event date:03.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59814132 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:BAXALTA GMBH, GLATTPARK, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER AG, WIEN, AT
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
Owner Name:BAXTER EASTERN EUROPE VERTRIEBS GMBH; AT
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN DE JURIDISCHE ENTITEIT; FORMER OWNER NAME: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Effective DATE:20160502
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)
Owner Name:BAXALTA INNOVATIONS GMBH; AT
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN NAAM VAN DE EIGENAAR(S); FORMER OWNER NAME: BAXTER TRADING GMBH
Effective DATE:20160502
 
Event date:30.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:01.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED; US
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Effective DATE:20160524
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160519 AND 20160525
 
Event date:08.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:BAXALTA INNOVATIONS GMBH
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:08.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED, US
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:08.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED, US
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:08.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:BAXALTA INNOVATIONS GMBH
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:08.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CJ
Code Expl.: CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:15.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT PC 379650 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE OWNER
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED, US
Effective DATE:20160623
 
Event date:15.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT PC 379650 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE OWNER
Owner Name:BAXALTA GMBH, CH
Effective DATE:20160623
 
Event date:29.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
Owner Name:BAXALTA GMBH
Effective DATE:20160823
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAXTER TRADING GMBH, AT
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER EASTERN EUROPE VERTRIEBS GMBH, AT
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAXTER INNOVATIONS GMBH, AT
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER TRADING GMBH, AT
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAXTER EASTERN EUROPE VERTRIEBS GMBH, AT
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, AT
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAXALTA INNOVATIONS GMBH, AT
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXTER INNOVATIONS GMBH, AT
 
Event date:15.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:BAXALTA INCORPORATED, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAXALTA INNOVATIONS GMBH, AT
 
Event date:15.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:KELLER AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG, CH
 
Event date:25.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170526
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170525
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20170527
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170524
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20170504
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20170510
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170601
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20170529
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:20.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59814132 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:22.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20180520
 
Event date:23.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180519
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:13.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20180519
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:03.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:15.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 379650 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20180520
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
Owner Name:BAXALTA GMBH; CH
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), AFFECTATION / CESSION; FORMER OWNER NAME: BAXTER INNOVATIONS GMBH
Effective DATE:20160527
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OF THE OWNERS
Owner Name:BAXTER INNOVATIONS GMBH; AT
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGEMENT NOM PROPRIETAIRE; FORMER OWNER NAME: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Effective DATE:20150601
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180520
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180519
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180520
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180530