Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991666

EP0991666 - ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSIN PREPARATION AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MATTES, Erwin
Friedhofgasse 38
A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
02 / MATTHIESSEN, H., Peter
Vorgartenstrasse 129-143/1/5
A-1020 Wien / AT
 [2007/48]
Former [2000/15]01 / MATTES, Erwin
Friedhofgasse 38
A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
02 / MATTHIESSEN, H., Peter
Waltergasse 12/2/6
A-1040 Wien / AT
Representative(s)Alge, Daniel , et al
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Alge, Daniel, Mag. Dr. rer.nat. , et al
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98921263.420.05.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998AT00130
Priority number, dateAT1997000100710.06.1997         Original published format: AT 100797
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856821
Date:17.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991666
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991666
Date:28.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/81, A61K38/57, C07K1/16
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesSI24.12.1999
TitleGerman:ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSIN-PRÄPARATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2000/15]
English:ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSIN PREPARATION AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2000/15]
French:PREPARATION D'ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2007Fee for grant paid
12.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.11.2007
GR29.02.2008
LU20.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
[2010/28]
Former [2010/05]CY28.11.2007
GR29.02.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/13]GR29.02.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]MC31.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0698615  (BAYER CORPORATION) [DX] 1-15,17-23,25-32 * page 7; example 1; claim 10 *;
 [X]WO9535306  (ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CORPORATION) [X] 1-15,17,19-23,25-29 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0221426  (MILES LABORATORIES, INC.) [X] 1-15,17-23,25-30 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0097274  (MILES LABORATORIES, INC.) [X] 1-15,17-23,25-30 * page 10, line 25 - page 13, line 19; example 4 *
 [X]  - S.K.CHAN ET AL., "PURIFICATION AND CHEMICAL COMPOSITIONS OF HUMAN ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSIN OF THE MM TYPE", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (197309), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 79 - 82, XP002075411 [X] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(73)80581-2
 [DX]  - V.Y. BASIS ET AL., "PURIFICATION OF HUMAN ALPHA-1-INHIBITOR OF PROTEASES AND PRODUCTION OF ANTISERUM FOR THE PROTEIN IMMUNOCHEMICAL ESTIMATION.", VOPROSY MEDICINSKOJ CHIMII, MOSCOW, RU, (1987), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 54 - 59, XP002075412 [DX] 1-6,13-17,23,24 * page 59 *
 [X]  - C.B. GLASER ET AL., "THE ISOLATION OF ALPHA-1-PROTEASE INHIBITOR BY A UNIQUE PROCEDURE DESIGNED FOR INDUSTRIAL APPLICATION.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY., NEW YORK US, (1982), vol. 124, pages 364 - 371, XP002075413 [X] 1-15,17,19-23,25-29 * the whole document *