Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974215

EP0974215 - DATA COMMUNICATION LINK IN A HIERARCHICAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK WITH A BUS, OPERATED USING AN INTERROGATION/RESPONSE PROTOCOL, THE SO-CALLED POLLING PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / HALLMANN, Dieter
Remsstrasse 10
D-74379 Ingersheim / DE
02 / HANUSA, Manfred
Fuerstenhof 1
D-71546 Aspach / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Camp, Ronald , et al
Marconi Intellectual Property
Crompton Close
Basildon
Essex SS14 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Camp, Ronald , et al
Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon
Essex SS14 3BA / GB
Former [2001/38]Camp, Ronald , et al
Marconi Intellectual Property Marrable House The Vineyards Gt. Baddow
Chelmsford Essex CM2 7QS / GB
Application number, filing date98921352.511.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998DE00710
Priority number, dateDE199711476110.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714761
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9845983
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974215
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/403, H04L29/14
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG IN HIERARCHISCHEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ MIT BUS, DIE NACH EINEM ABFRAGE/ANTWORT-PROTOKOLL, DEM SOGENANNTEN POLLING-PROTOKOLL, BETRIEBEN WIRD[2000/04]
English:DATA COMMUNICATION LINK IN A HIERARCHICAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK WITH A BUS, OPERATED USING AN INTERROGATION/RESPONSE PROTOCOL, THE SO-CALLED POLLING PROTOCOL[2000/04]
French:LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION HIERARCHIQUE A BUS, FONCTIONNANT SELON UN PROTOCOLE DEMANDE/REPONSE, A SAVOIR SELON LE "PROTOCOLE D'APPEL SELECTIF"[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase10.11.1999National basic fee paid 
10.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
17.09.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US5544314  (FUCHSREITER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 1, line 48 - line 64 * * column 3, line 14 - line 28 *;
 [A]DE3736081  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 26 *;
 [A]EP0559314  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 34 *;
 [A]US5122794  (WARRIOR JOGESH [US]) [A] 1-9 * column A * * column 1, line 46 - line 55 * * column 2, line 8 - line 17 * * column 5, line 32 - line 47 *;
 [A]US5390188  (DAWSON JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-9 * column A * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, line 5 - line 22 * * column 31, line 51 - column 32, line 37 *